Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2501 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2501
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to insurance requirements for certain nonemergency
 medical transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1954.001(4), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (4)  "Transportation network company" means a
 corporation, partnership, sole proprietorship, or other entity
 operating in this state that uses a digital network to connect a
 transportation network company rider to a transportation network
 company driver for a prearranged ride.  [The term does not include
 an entity arranging nonemergency medical transportation under a
 contract with the state or a managed care organization for
 individuals qualifying for Medicaid or Medicare.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 1954.002, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1954.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER.  (a) This chapter
 applies to automobile insurance policies in this state, including
 policies issued by a Lloyd's plan, a reciprocal or interinsurance
 exchange, and a county mutual insurance company.
 (b)  This chapter does not apply to an entity arranging
 nonemergency medical transportation services under a contract with
 the state or a managed care organization for individuals qualifying
 for Medicaid or Medicare unless the entity:
 (1)  provides the transportation services through a
 digital network that connects transportation network company
 drivers to transportation network company riders for prearranged
 rides;
 (2)  contracts individually with each transportation
 network company driver who is connected to transportation network
 company riders for the prearranged rides through the entity's
 digital network; and
 (3)  otherwise meets all requirements under the
 Medicaid or Medicare program for delivery of nonemergency medical
 transportation services.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *