Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2546 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 2546
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to completion of work status reports by a physician
 assistant under the workers' compensation system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 408.025, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A treating doctor may delegate to a physician
 assistant who is licensed to practice in this state under Chapter
 204, Occupations Code, the authority to complete and sign a work
 status report regarding an injured employee's ability to return to
 work. The delegating treating doctor is responsible for the acts of
 the physician assistant under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *