E
|
05/29/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3742
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3746
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3605
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1965
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1637
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 842
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#134
|
Journal Page: 959
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 924
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#121
|
Journal Page: 923
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 387
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 387
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|