Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB256 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hernandez, Murphy, Bohac H.B. No. 256
 (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2017;
 April 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a city attorney to seek an injunction
 to abate a common nuisance under the Alcoholic Beverage Code.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 101.70, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The city attorney in the city where the nuisance
 exists may sue in the name of the city for an injunction to abate and
 temporarily and permanently enjoin it. Except as otherwise
 provided in this section, the proceeding is conducted as other
 similar proceedings.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *