Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2610 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2610
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the term for a lease of land owned by certain navigation
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 60.039, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The]
 commission may lease the surface of land for not more than 50 years
 by the entry of an order on the minutes of the commission and the
 execution of a lease in the manner provided by the original order.
 The lease may not be extended beyond the 50-year period by renewal,
 extension, or otherwise.
 (c)  This subsection applies only to a district that operates
 a port in this state that is wholly located in a county that borders
 the Gulf of Mexico and that is adjacent to a county that contains an
 international border and borders the Gulf of Mexico.  The district
 may lease the surface of land for not more than 99 years or may
 extend a lease to a period not to exceed 99 years only if:
 (1)  the lease conveys an interest in the surface of the
 land for residential purposes only;
 (2)  at the time the lease will be entered into or
 extended, the district has not less than 50 leases in effect that
 convey an interest in the land surface for residential purposes
 only; and
 (3)  any part of the land owned by the district is
 subdivided into lots intended for residential use.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *