1 | 1 | | 85R23554 JCG-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Thompson of Harris, Hernandez H.B. No. 2629 |
---|
3 | 3 | | Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2629: |
---|
4 | 4 | | By: Kuempel C.S.H.B. No. 2629 |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to notice and continuing education requirements regarding |
---|
10 | 10 | | human trafficking for cosmetologists and cosmetology facilities. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Section 1602.354, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
13 | 13 | | by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (c) The commission shall require continuing education |
---|
15 | 15 | | programs under this chapter to include information on: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) activities commonly associated with human |
---|
17 | 17 | | trafficking; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (2) recognition of potential victims of human |
---|
19 | 19 | | trafficking; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | (3) methods for assisting victims of human |
---|
21 | 21 | | trafficking, including how to report human trafficking. |
---|
22 | 22 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter I, Chapter 1602, Occupations Code, is |
---|
23 | 23 | | amended by adding Section 1602.408 to read as follows: |
---|
24 | 24 | | Sec. 1602.408. POSTING OF CERTAIN NOTICES REQUIRED. (a) In |
---|
25 | 25 | | this section, "licensed facility" means the premises of a place of |
---|
26 | 26 | | business that holds a license, certificate, or permit under this |
---|
27 | 27 | | chapter. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) A licensed facility shall display a sign approved by or |
---|
29 | 29 | | acceptable to the commission or the department concerning services |
---|
30 | 30 | | and assistance available to victims of human trafficking. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) The sign required by this section must be in English, |
---|
32 | 32 | | Spanish, and Vietnamese and include a toll-free telephone number of |
---|
33 | 33 | | a nationally recognized information and referral hotline for |
---|
34 | 34 | | victims of human trafficking. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (d) The commission by rule shall establish requirements |
---|
36 | 36 | | regarding the posting of signs under this section. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 3. (a) Not later than March 1, 2018, the Texas |
---|
38 | 38 | | Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules as |
---|
39 | 39 | | necessary to comply with Section 1602.354, Occupations Code, as |
---|
40 | 40 | | amended by this Act. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) Section 1602.354(c), Occupations Code, as added by this |
---|
42 | 42 | | Act, and the rules adopted under Subsection (a) of this section |
---|
43 | 43 | | apply only to a continuing education program provided on or after |
---|
44 | 44 | | September 1, 2018. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 4. (a) Not later than January 1, 2018, the Texas |
---|
46 | 46 | | Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules as |
---|
47 | 47 | | necessary to implement Section 1602.408, Occupations Code, as added |
---|
48 | 48 | | by this Act. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (b) A licensed facility as defined by Section 1602.408(a), |
---|
50 | 50 | | Occupations Code, as added by this Act, shall comply with Section |
---|
51 | 51 | | 1602.408, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than |
---|
52 | 52 | | February 1, 2018. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|