Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2629 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R23554 JCG-F
 By: Thompson of Harris, Hernandez H.B. No. 2629
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2629:
 By:  Kuempel C.S.H.B. No. 2629


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice and continuing education requirements regarding
 human trafficking for cosmetologists and cosmetology facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1602.354, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The commission shall require continuing education
 programs under this chapter to include information on:
 (1)  activities commonly associated with human
 trafficking;
 (2)  recognition of potential victims of human
 trafficking; and
 (3)  methods for assisting victims of human
 trafficking, including how to report human trafficking.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter I, Chapter 1602, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1602.408 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1602.408.  POSTING OF CERTAIN NOTICES REQUIRED. (a) In
 this section, "licensed facility" means the premises of a place of
 business that holds a license, certificate, or permit under this
 chapter.
 (b)  A licensed facility shall display a sign approved by or
 acceptable to the commission or the department concerning services
 and assistance available to victims of human trafficking.
 (c)  The sign required by this section must be in English,
 Spanish, and Vietnamese and include a toll-free telephone number of
 a nationally recognized information and referral hotline for
 victims of human trafficking.
 (d)  The commission by rule shall establish requirements
 regarding the posting of signs under this section.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than March 1, 2018, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules as
 necessary to comply with Section 1602.354, Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 (b)  Section 1602.354(c), Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act, and the rules adopted under Subsection (a) of this section
 apply only to a continuing education program provided on or after
 September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2018, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules as
 necessary to implement Section 1602.408, Occupations Code, as added
 by this Act.
 (b)  A licensed facility as defined by Section 1602.408(a),
 Occupations Code, as added by this Act, shall comply with Section
 1602.408, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 February 1, 2018.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.