House | 05/08/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 794 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 794 | |
House | 03/01/2017 | Filed |