House
|
05/01/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#577
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Failed to pass to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/1/17 5:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1694
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1694
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 824
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 824
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|