House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4859
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4859
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4859
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4175
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2445
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
FA2 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2270
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2270
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1240
|
Journal Page: 3428
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3428
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3428
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1197
|
Journal Page: 3368
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3368
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
5-G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3368
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3368
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/11/17 8:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 825
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 825
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|