LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB2691
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2691
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2691
Compare Versions
HB2691 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2691 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2691 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
HB2691 Engrossed May 12, 2017
HB2691 Comm Sub May 3, 2017
HB2691 Introduced March 2, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB2691 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2691 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2691 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
HB2691 Engrossed May 12, 2017
HB2691 Comm Sub May 3, 2017
HB2691 Introduced March 2, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare