Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2729 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 2729
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
3- May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2729
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to an inventory of credentials and certificates that may
126 be earned by a public high school student through a career and
137 technology education program.
148 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
159 SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
1610 amended by adding Section 29.189 to read as follows:
1711 Sec. 29.189. INVENTORY OF CREDENTIALS AND CERTIFICATES.
1812 (a) In this section:
1913 (1) "Commission" means the Texas Workforce
2014 Commission.
2115 (2) "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
2216 Education Coordinating Board.
2317 (b) The agency, the coordinating board, and the commission
2418 shall jointly develop and post on their respective Internet
2519 websites an inventory of industry-recognized credentials and
2620 certificates that may be earned by a public high school student
2721 through a career and technology education program and that:
2822 (1) are aligned to state and regional workforce needs;
2923 and
3024 (2) serve as an entry point to middle- and high-wage
3125 jobs.
3226 (c) The inventory must include for each credential or
3327 certificate:
3428 (1) the associated career cluster;
3529 (2) the awarding entity;
3630 (3) the level of education required and any additional
3731 requirements for the credential or certificate;
3832 (4) any fees for obtaining the credential or
3933 certificate; and
4034 (5) the average wage or salary for jobs that require or
4135 prefer the credential or certificate.
4236 (d) Each year, the agency, the coordinating board, and the
4337 commission jointly shall:
4438 (1) review and, if necessary, update the inventory;
4539 and
4640 (2) provide a copy of the inventory to each school
4741 district and public institution of higher education that offers a
4842 career and technology education program to public high school
4943 students.
5044 SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2018, the Texas
5145 Education Agency, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board,
5246 and the Texas Workforce Commission shall jointly develop and post
5347 on their respective Internet websites the inventory required under
5448 Section 29.189, Education Code, as added by this Act.
5549 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5650 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5751 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5852 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5953 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
60- * * * * *
54+ ______________________________ ______________________________
55+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
56+ I certify that H.B. No. 2729 was passed by the House on April
57+ 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
58+ voting.
59+ ______________________________
60+ Chief Clerk of the House
61+ I certify that H.B. No. 2729 was passed by the Senate on May
62+ 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
63+ ______________________________
64+ Secretary of the Senate
65+ APPROVED: _____________________
66+ Date
67+ _____________________
68+ Governor