Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2729 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 2729
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an inventory of credentials and certificates that may
 be earned by a public high school student through a career and
 technology education program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.189 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.189.  INVENTORY OF CREDENTIALS AND CERTIFICATES.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Workforce
 Commission.
 (2)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (b)  The agency, the coordinating board, and the commission
 shall jointly develop and post on their respective Internet
 websites an inventory of industry-recognized credentials and
 certificates that may be earned by a public high school student
 through a career and technology education program and that:
 (1)  are aligned to state and regional workforce needs;
 and
 (2)  serve as an entry point to middle- and high-wage
 jobs.
 (c)  The inventory must include for each credential or
 certificate:
 (1)  the associated career cluster;
 (2)  the awarding entity;
 (3)  the level of education required and any additional
 requirements for the credential or certificate;
 (4)  any fees for obtaining the credential or
 certificate; and
 (5)  the average wage or salary for jobs that require or
 prefer the credential or certificate.
 (d)  Each year, the agency, the coordinating board, and the
 commission jointly shall:
 (1)  review and, if necessary, update the inventory;
 and
 (2)  provide a copy of the inventory to each school
 district and public institution of higher education that offers a
 career and technology education program to public high school
 students.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2018, the Texas
 Education Agency, the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board,
 and the Texas Workforce Commission shall jointly develop and post
 on their respective Internet websites the inventory required under
 Section 29.189, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *