Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2471
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2471
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1475
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 905
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 905
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|