Senate | 05/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2573 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1947 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1947 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1919 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3492 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Record vote | RV#1229 | Journal Page: 3420 |
House | 05/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3420 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3420 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3341 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Amended | 1-Wilson | Journal Page: 3341 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3341 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 858 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 858 | |
House | 03/03/2017 | Filed |