E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3993
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3781
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#601
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2074
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|