Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2783 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Smithee (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2783
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the assessment of litigation costs and attorney fees in
 certain lawsuits under the public information law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.323(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In an action brought under Section 552.321 or 552.3215,
 the court shall assess costs of litigation and reasonable attorney
 fees incurred by a plaintiff who substantially prevails or may
 assess costs of litigation and reasonable attorney fees incurred by
 a plaintiff to whom a governmental body voluntarily releases the
 requested information after filing an answer to the suit, except
 that the court may not assess those costs and fees against a
 governmental body if the court finds that the governmental body
 acted in reasonable reliance on:
 (1)  a judgment or an order of a court applicable to the
 governmental body;
 (2)  the published opinion of an appellate court; or
 (3)  a written decision of the attorney general,
 including a decision issued under Subchapter G or an opinion issued
 under Section 402.042.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a suit filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A suit
 filed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *