E | 06/09/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/09/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/30/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6063 | |
Senate | 05/29/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4242 | |
House | 05/28/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6032 | |
House | 05/27/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6040 | |
House | 05/25/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4825 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3042 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3042 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3042 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3042 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3042 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3042 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3042 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1907 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1175 | Journal Page: 3279 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3279 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Amended | 1-White | Journal Page: 3279 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3279 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3234 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3234 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Amended | 1-Workman | Journal Page: 3233 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3233 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2460 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 858 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 858 | |
House | 03/03/2017 | Filed |