E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4888
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1825
|
Journal Page: 4889
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4888
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4572
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#494
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|