LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB2792
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2792
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2792
Compare Versions
HB2792 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2792 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2792 Enrolled May 27, 2017
HB2792 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
HB2792 Engrossed April 27, 2017
HB2792 Comm Sub April 19, 2017
HB2792 Introduced March 7, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB2792 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2792 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2792 Enrolled May 27, 2017
HB2792 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
HB2792 Engrossed April 27, 2017
HB2792 Comm Sub April 19, 2017
HB2792 Introduced March 7, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare