E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1010
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1509
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#227
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Howard
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
House
|
11/14/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|