Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB281 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Howard, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 281
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
3- April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Criminal Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the
5- following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 281
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to establishing a statewide electronic tracking system for
126 evidence of a sex offense.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter B, Chapter 420,
159 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
1610 SUBCHAPTER B. COLLECTION, [AND] PRESERVATION, AND TRACKING OF
1711 EVIDENCE OF SEX OFFENSE
1812 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 420, Government Code, is
1913 amended by adding Section 420.034 to read as follows:
2014 Sec. 420.034. STATEWIDE ELECTRONIC TRACKING SYSTEM. (a)
2115 For purposes of this section, "evidence" means evidence collected
2216 during the investigation of an alleged sexual assault or other sex
2317 offense, including:
2418 (1) evidence from an evidence collection kit used to
2519 collect and preserve evidence of a sexual assault or other sex
2620 offense; and
2721 (2) other biological evidence of a sexual assault or
2822 other sex offense.
2923 (b) The department shall develop and implement a statewide
3024 electronic tracking system for evidence collected in relation to a
3125 sexual assault or other sex offense.
3226 (c) The tracking system must:
3327 (1) track the location and status of each item of
3428 evidence through the criminal justice process, including the
3529 initial collection of the item of evidence in a forensic medical
3630 examination, receipt and storage of the item of evidence at a law
3731 enforcement agency, receipt and analysis of the item of evidence at
3832 an accredited crime laboratory, and storage and destruction of the
3933 item of evidence after the item is analyzed;
4034 (2) allow a facility or entity performing a forensic
4135 medical examination of a survivor, law enforcement agency,
4236 accredited crime laboratory, prosecutor, or other entity providing
4337 a chain of custody for an item of evidence to update and track the
4438 status and location of the item; and
4539 (3) allow a survivor to anonymously track or receive
4640 updates regarding the status and location of each item of evidence
4741 collected in relation to the offense.
4842 (d) The department shall require participation in the
4943 tracking system by any facility or entity that collects evidence of
5044 a sexual assault or other sex offense or investigates or prosecutes
5145 a sexual assault or other sex offense for which evidence has been
5246 collected.
5347 (e) Records entered into the tracking system are
5448 confidential and are not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552.
5549 Records relating to evidence tracked under the system may be
5650 accessed only by:
5751 (1) the survivor from whom the evidence was collected;
5852 or
5953 (2) an employee of a facility or entity described by
6054 Subsection (d), for purposes of updating or tracking the status or
6155 location of an item of evidence.
6256 (f) An employee of the department or a facility or entity
6357 described by Subsection (d) may not disclose to a parent or legal
6458 guardian of a survivor information that would aid the parent or
6559 legal guardian in accessing records relating to evidence tracked
6660 under the system if the employee knows or has reason to believe that
6761 the parent or legal guardian is a suspect or a suspected accomplice
6862 in the commission of the offense with respect to which evidence was
6963 collected.
7064 (g) To assist in establishing and maintaining the statewide
7165 electronic tracking system under this section, the department may
7266 accept gifts, grants, or donations from any person or entity.
7367 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than September 1, 2019, the
7468 Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas shall require all
7569 facilities and entities described by Section 420.034(d),
7670 Government Code, as added by this Act, to participate in the
7771 statewide electronic tracking system established under that
7872 section.
7973 (b) Section 420.034, Government Code, as added by this Act,
8074 applies only to evidence collected on or after the date on which a
8175 facility or entity is first required under Subsection (a) of this
8276 section to participate in the statewide electronic tracking system.
8377 Evidence collected before that date is not required to be tracked
8478 under the tracking system.
8579 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
86- * * * * *
80+ ______________________________ ______________________________
81+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
82+ I certify that H.B. No. 281 was passed by the House on April
83+ 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
84+ voting.
85+ ______________________________
86+ Chief Clerk of the House
87+ I certify that H.B. No. 281 was passed by the Senate on May
88+ 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
89+ ______________________________
90+ Secretary of the Senate
91+ APPROVED: _____________________
92+ Date
93+ _____________________
94+ Governor