Senate | 05/23/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2222 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably as amended | Journal Page: 2020 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 793 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Record vote | RV#118 | Journal Page: 920 |
House | 03/29/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 777 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/20/2017 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 362 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 362 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |