Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB283 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Herrero, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 283
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 30, 2017;
33 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
44 Affairs & Border Security; May 16, 2017, reported favorably, as
55 amended, by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent
66 to printer.)
77
88
99 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By: Lucio
1010 Amend H.B. No. 283 (house engrossed version) by adding the
1111 following appropriately numbered SECTION to the bill and
1212 renumbering subsequent SECTIONS of the bill accordingly:
1313 SECTION ____. The Department of State Health Services is
1414 required to implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates
1515 money specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not
1616 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the department
1717 may, but is not required to, implement this Act using other
1818 appropriations available for that purpose.
1919 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
2020 AN ACT
2121 relating to the creation of an open burn pit registry for certain
2222 service members and veterans.
2323 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
2424 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as the Service Member and
2525 Veteran Open Burn Pit Registry Act.
2626 SECTION 2. Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
2727 amended by adding Chapter 99 to read as follows:
2828 CHAPTER 99. OPEN BURN PIT REGISTRY
2929 Sec. 99.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
3030 (1) "Airborne hazard" means an airborne environmental
3131 contaminant, including open burn pit smoke, oil well fire smoke,
3232 sand, dust, or other particles, that may cause short-term or
3333 long-term health effects to a person exposed to the contaminant.
3434 (2) "Open burn pit," also known as an "open air burn
3535 pit," means a site used for solid waste disposal by burning the
3636 waste in the outdoor air without the use of a commercially
3737 manufactured incinerator or other equipment specifically designed
3838 and manufactured for burning solid waste.
3939 (3) "Service member" means an individual who is
4040 currently serving in:
4141 (A) the armed forces of the United States;
4242 (B) an auxiliary service of one of the armed
4343 forces of the United States, including the National Guard; or
4444 (C) the state military forces as defined by
4545 Section 431.001, Government Code.
4646 (4) "Veteran" means an individual who has served in:
4747 (A) the armed forces of the United States;
4848 (B) an auxiliary service of one of the armed
4949 forces of the United States, including the National Guard; or
5050 (C) the state military forces as defined by
5151 Section 431.001, Government Code.
5252 Sec. 99.002. RULES; MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING. The
5353 executive commissioner shall adopt the rules necessary to
5454 administer this chapter and may enter into a memorandum of
5555 understanding with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
5656 as necessary to administer this chapter.
5757 Sec. 99.003. OPEN BURN PIT REGISTRY. (a) For outreach,
5858 education, and advocacy related to exposure to open burn pit smoke
5959 or other airborne hazards by service members and veterans in this
6060 state, the department shall create and maintain an open burn pit
6161 registry of service members and veterans who were exposed to open
6262 burn pit smoke or other airborne hazards during their military
6363 service in:
6464 (1) the Southwest Asia theater of operations on or
6565 after August 2, 1990;
6666 (2) Operation Desert Shield or Desert Storm;
6767 (3) Djibouti, Africa, on or after September 11, 2001;
6868 (4) Operation Enduring Freedom, Iraqi Freedom, or New
6969 Dawn; or
7070 (5) any other conflict or theater identified by the
7171 United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
7272 (b) The department shall include for each entry in the open
7373 burn pit registry:
7474 (1) the service member's or veteran's name, address,
7575 phone number, and electronic address;
7676 (2) the location of the service member's or veteran's
7777 service and the period of service;
7878 (3) any medical condition or death of the service
7979 member or veteran that may be related to exposure to open burn pit
8080 smoke or other airborne hazards; and
8181 (4) any other information that the department or the
8282 United States Department of Veterans Affairs considers necessary.
8383 (c) The department shall:
8484 (1) share the information included in the department's
8585 open burn pit registry with the United States Department of
8686 Veterans Affairs Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry; and
8787 (2) electronically link the open burn pit registry
8888 created under this chapter with the federal registry.
8989 Sec. 99.004. VOLUNTARY REGISTRATION. A service member or
9090 veteran described by Section 99.003, or a family member of that
9191 service member or veteran, may voluntarily register a case of
9292 exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne hazards with the
9393 department for inclusion in the registry.
9494 Sec. 99.005. CONFIDENTIALITY. Entries and information
9595 obtained under this chapter are confidential and are not subject to
9696 disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code, are not subject to
9797 subpoena, and may not otherwise be released or made public except as
9898 provided by this section or Section 99.003.
9999 Sec. 99.006. OPEN BURN PIT INFORMATION. The department,
100100 with the assistance of the Texas Veterans Commission, shall develop
101101 and include on its Internet website information to inform service
102102 members, veterans, and their families about the:
103103 (1) registration and use of the department's open burn
104104 pit registry and the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
105105 Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry;
106106 (2) most recent scientific developments on the health
107107 effects of exposure to open burn pit smoke and other airborne
108108 hazards and the status of any illness or condition that is presumed
109109 to be caused by exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne
110110 hazards as designated by the United States Department of Veterans
111111 Affairs;
112112 (3) availability of any treatment offered by the
113113 United States Department of Veterans Affairs for an illness or
114114 condition that may be caused by exposure to open burn pit smoke or
115115 other airborne hazards;
116116 (4) process for applying to the United States
117117 Department of Veterans Affairs for service-related disability
118118 compensation for an illness or condition that may be related to
119119 exposure to open burn pit smoke or other airborne hazards,
120120 including the methods for documenting the illness or condition; and
121121 (5) manner of appealing to the United States
122122 Department of Veterans Affairs an existing service-related
123123 disability rating decision or requesting an increased
124124 service-related disability rating based on an illness or condition
125125 that may be related to exposure to open burn pit smoke or other
126126 airborne hazards.
127127 Sec. 99.007. REPORT. Not later than December 1 of each
128128 even-numbered year following the creation of the registry, the
129129 department shall submit a report to the appropriate standing
130130 committees of the house of representatives and senate that
131131 includes:
132132 (1) an assessment of the effectiveness of collection
133133 and maintenance of information on the health effects of exposure to
134134 open burn pit smoke and other airborne hazards; and
135135 (2) any recommendation to improve the collection and
136136 maintenance of information about the health effects of exposure to
137137 open burn pit smoke and other airborne hazards.
138138 SECTION 3. (a) Not later than March 1, 2018, the executive
139139 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
140140 adopt the rules and enter into any memorandum of understanding
141141 necessary to administer this Act.
142142 (b) Notwithstanding Section 99.007, Health and Safety Code,
143143 as added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2018, the
144144 Department of State Health Services shall submit an initial report
145145 under that section.
146146 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
147147 * * * * *