1 | | - | By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2895 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017; |
---|
3 | | - | May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
4 | | - | Education; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | | - | Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 2895 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the requirement that certain public institutions of |
---|
12 | 6 | | higher education post mental health resources on the institution's |
---|
13 | 7 | | Internet website. |
---|
14 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 51.9193, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
16 | 10 | | amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read as |
---|
17 | 11 | | follows: |
---|
18 | 12 | | (c) Each institution to which this section applies shall: |
---|
19 | 13 | | (1) create a web page on the institution's Internet |
---|
20 | 14 | | website that: |
---|
21 | 15 | | (A) is dedicated solely to information regarding |
---|
22 | 16 | | the mental health resources available to students at the |
---|
23 | 17 | | institution, regardless of whether the resources are provided by |
---|
24 | 18 | | the institution; and |
---|
25 | 19 | | (B) includes[. The web page must include] the |
---|
26 | 20 | | address of the nearest local mental health authority; and |
---|
27 | 21 | | (2) maintain a conspicuous link on the institution's |
---|
28 | 22 | | Internet website home page to the web page described by Subdivision |
---|
29 | 23 | | (1). |
---|
30 | 24 | | (d) Not later than August 1 of each year, the president or |
---|
31 | 25 | | the president's designee of an institution to which this section |
---|
32 | 26 | | applies shall certify to the Texas Higher Education Coordinating |
---|
33 | 27 | | Board the institution's compliance with this section. |
---|
34 | 28 | | SECTION 2. An institution of higher education to which |
---|
35 | 29 | | Section 51.9193, Education Code, applies shall comply with Section |
---|
36 | 30 | | 51.9193(c), Education Code, as amended by this Act, not later than |
---|
37 | 31 | | December 1, 2017. |
---|
38 | 32 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
39 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 33 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 34 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 35 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2895 was passed by the House on May 2, |
---|
| 36 | + | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
| 37 | + | voting. |
---|
| 38 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 40 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2895 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 41 | + | 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
| 42 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 43 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 44 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Date |
---|
| 46 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 47 | + | Governor |
---|