By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2895 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017; May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the requirement that certain public institutions of higher education post mental health resources on the institution's Internet website. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 51.9193, Education Code, is amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: (c) Each institution to which this section applies shall: (1) create a web page on the institution's Internet website that: (A) is dedicated solely to information regarding the mental health resources available to students at the institution, regardless of whether the resources are provided by the institution; and (B) includes[. The web page must include] the address of the nearest local mental health authority; and (2) maintain a conspicuous link on the institution's Internet website home page to the web page described by Subdivision (1). (d) Not later than August 1 of each year, the president or the president's designee of an institution to which this section applies shall certify to the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board the institution's compliance with this section. SECTION 2. An institution of higher education to which Section 51.9193, Education Code, applies shall comply with Section 51.9193(c), Education Code, as amended by this Act, not later than December 1, 2017. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *