Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2904 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: White (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2904
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
3- May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4- Human Services; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following
5- vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2904
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the memorandum of understanding among certain agencies
126 to coordinate services provided to persons needing multiagency
137 services.
148 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
159 SECTION 1. Section 531.055, Government Code, is amended by
1610 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (e) and adding Subsection (f) to
1711 read as follows:
1812 (a) The Health and Human Services Commission, the
1913 Department of Family and Protective Services, the Department of
2014 State Health Services, the Texas Education Agency [Each health and
2115 human services agency], the Texas Correctional Office on Offenders
2216 with Medical or Mental Impairments, the Texas Department of
2317 Criminal Justice, the Texas Department of Housing and Community
2418 Affairs, the Texas Workforce Commission, and the Texas Juvenile
2519 Justice Department shall enter into a joint memorandum of
2620 understanding to promote a system of local-level interagency
2721 staffing groups to identify and coordinate services for persons
2822 needing multiagency services to be provided in the least
2923 restrictive setting appropriate, using residential, institutional,
3024 or congregate care settings only as a last resort. The division
3125 within the Health and Human Services Commission that coordinates
3226 the policy and delivery of mental health services shall oversee the
3327 development and implementation of the joint memorandum of
3428 understanding.
3529 (b) The memorandum must:
3630 (1) clarify the statutory responsibilities of each
3731 agency in relation to persons needing multiagency services,
3832 including subcategories for different services such as:
3933 (A) [prevention,] family preservation and
4034 strengthening;
4135 (B) physical and behavioral health care;
4236 (C) prevention and early intervention services,
4337 including services designed to prevent:
4438 (i) child abuse;
4539 (ii) neglect; or
4640 (iii) delinquency, truancy, or school
4741 dropout;
4842 (D) diversion from juvenile or criminal justice
4943 involvement;
5044 (E) housing;
5145 (F) [,] aging in place;
5246 (G) [,] emergency shelter;
5347 (H) [, diagnosis and evaluation,] residential
5448 care;
5549 (I) [,] after-care;
5650 (J) [,] information and referral;[, medical
5751 care,] and
5852 (K) investigation services;
5953 (2) include a functional definition of "persons
6054 needing multiagency services";
6155 (3) outline membership, officers, and necessary
6256 standing committees of local-level interagency staffing groups;
6357 (4) define procedures aimed at eliminating
6458 duplication of services relating to assessment and diagnosis,
6559 treatment, residential placement and care, and case management of
6660 persons needing multiagency services;
6761 (5) define procedures for addressing disputes between
6862 the agencies that relate to the agencies' areas of service
6963 responsibilities;
7064 (6) provide that each local-level interagency
7165 staffing group includes:
7266 (A) a local representative of each agency;
7367 (B) representatives of local private sector
7468 agencies; and
7569 (C) family members or caregivers of persons
7670 needing multiagency services or other current or previous consumers
7771 of multiagency services acting as general consumer advocates;
7872 (7) provide that the local representative of each
7973 agency has authority to contribute agency resources to solving
8074 problems identified by the local-level interagency staffing group;
8175 (8) provide that if a person's needs exceed the
8276 resources of an agency, the agency may, with the consent of the
8377 person's legal guardian, if applicable, submit a referral on behalf
8478 of the person to the local-level interagency staffing group for
8579 consideration;
8680 (9) provide that a local-level interagency staffing
8781 group may be called together by a representative of any member
8882 agency;
8983 (10) provide that an agency representative may be
9084 excused from attending a meeting if the staffing group determines
9185 that the age or needs of the person to be considered are clearly not
9286 within the agency's service responsibilities, provided that each
9387 agency representative is encouraged to attend all meetings to
9488 contribute to the collective ability of the staffing group to solve
9589 a person's need for multiagency services;
9690 (11) define the relationship between state-level
9791 interagency staffing groups and local-level interagency staffing
9892 groups in a manner that defines, supports, and maintains local
9993 autonomy;
10094 (12) provide that records that are used or developed
10195 by a local-level interagency staffing group or its members that
10296 relate to a particular person are confidential and may not be
10397 released to any other person or agency except as provided by this
10498 section or by other law; and
10599 (13) provide a procedure that permits the agencies to
106100 share confidential information while preserving the confidential
107101 nature of the information.
108102 (e) The agencies shall ensure that a state-level
109103 interagency staffing group provides:
110104 (1) information and guidance to local-level
111105 interagency staffing groups regarding:
112106 (A) the availability of programs and resources in
113107 the community; and
114108 (B) best practices for addressing the needs of
115109 persons with complex needs in the least restrictive setting
116110 appropriate; and
117111 (2) a biennial report to the administrative head of
118112 each agency, the legislature, and the governor that includes:
119113 (A) [(1)] the number of persons served through
120114 the local-level interagency staffing groups and the outcomes of the
121115 services provided;
122116 (B) [(2)] a description of any barriers
123117 identified to the state's ability to provide effective services to
124118 persons needing multiagency services; and
125119 (C) [(3)] any other information relevant to
126120 improving the delivery of services to persons needing multiagency
127121 services.
128122 (f) In this section, "least restrictive setting" means a
129123 service setting for a person that, in comparison to other available
130124 service settings:
131125 (1) is most able to meet the identified needs of the
132126 person;
133127 (2) prioritizes a home and community-based care
134128 setting; and
135129 (3) engages the strengths of the family.
136130 SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date
137131 of this Act, but not later than December 1, 2017, the Health and
138132 Human Services Commission, the Department of Family and Protective
139133 Services, the Department of State Health Services, the Texas
140134 Education Agency, the Texas Correctional Office on Offenders with
141135 Medical or Mental Impairments, the Texas Department of Criminal
142136 Justice, the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs, the
143137 Texas Workforce Commission, and the Texas Juvenile Justice
144138 Department shall update the joint memorandum of understanding
145139 required under Section 531.055, Government Code, as amended by this
146140 Act.
147141 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
148- * * * * *
142+ ______________________________ ______________________________
143+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
144+ I certify that H.B. No. 2904 was passed by the House on May 4,
145+ 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 3, 2 present, not
146+ voting.
147+ ______________________________
148+ Chief Clerk of the House
149+ I certify that H.B. No. 2904 was passed by the Senate on May
150+ 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
151+ ______________________________
152+ Secretary of the Senate
153+ APPROVED: _____________________
154+ Date
155+ _____________________
156+ Governor