Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2904 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: White (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2904
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the memorandum of understanding among certain agencies
 to coordinate services provided to persons needing multiagency
 services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 531.055, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (e) and adding Subsection (f) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The Health and Human Services Commission, the
 Department of Family and Protective Services, the Department of
 State Health Services, the Texas Education Agency [Each health and
 human services agency], the Texas Correctional Office on Offenders
 with Medical or Mental Impairments, the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice, the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs, the Texas Workforce Commission, and the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department shall enter into a joint memorandum of
 understanding to promote a system of local-level interagency
 staffing groups to identify and coordinate services for persons
 needing multiagency services to be provided in the least
 restrictive setting appropriate, using residential, institutional,
 or congregate care settings only as a last resort.  The division
 within the Health and Human Services Commission that coordinates
 the policy and delivery of mental health services shall oversee the
 development and implementation of the joint memorandum of
 understanding.
 (b)  The memorandum must:
 (1)  clarify the statutory responsibilities of each
 agency in relation to persons needing multiagency services,
 including subcategories for different services such as:
 (A)  [prevention,] family preservation and
 strengthening;
 (B)  physical and behavioral health care;
 (C)  prevention and early intervention services,
 including services designed to prevent:
 (i)  child abuse;
 (ii)  neglect; or
 (iii)  delinquency, truancy, or school
 dropout;
 (D)  diversion from juvenile or criminal justice
 involvement;
 (E)  housing;
 (F)  [,] aging in place;
 (G)  [,] emergency shelter;
 (H)  [, diagnosis and evaluation,] residential
 care;
 (I)  [,] after-care;
 (J)  [,] information and referral;[, medical
 care,] and
 (K)  investigation services;
 (2)  include a functional definition of "persons
 needing multiagency services";
 (3)  outline membership, officers, and necessary
 standing committees of local-level interagency staffing groups;
 (4)  define procedures aimed at eliminating
 duplication of services relating to assessment and diagnosis,
 treatment, residential placement and care, and case management of
 persons needing multiagency services;
 (5)  define procedures for addressing disputes between
 the agencies that relate to the agencies' areas of service
 responsibilities;
 (6)  provide that each local-level interagency
 staffing group includes:
 (A)  a local representative of each agency;
 (B)  representatives of local private sector
 agencies; and
 (C)  family members or caregivers of persons
 needing multiagency services or other current or previous consumers
 of multiagency services acting as general consumer advocates;
 (7)  provide that the local representative of each
 agency has authority to contribute agency resources to solving
 problems identified by the local-level interagency staffing group;
 (8)  provide that if a person's needs exceed the
 resources of an agency, the agency may, with the consent of the
 person's legal guardian, if applicable, submit a referral on behalf
 of the person to the local-level interagency staffing group for
 consideration;
 (9)  provide that a local-level interagency staffing
 group may be called together by a representative of any member
 agency;
 (10)  provide that an agency representative may be
 excused from attending a meeting if the staffing group determines
 that the age or needs of the person to be considered are clearly not
 within the agency's service responsibilities, provided that each
 agency representative is encouraged to attend all meetings to
 contribute to the collective ability of the staffing group to solve
 a person's need for multiagency services;
 (11)  define the relationship between state-level
 interagency staffing groups and local-level interagency staffing
 groups in a manner that defines, supports, and maintains local
 autonomy;
 (12)  provide that records that are used or developed
 by a local-level interagency staffing group or its members that
 relate to a particular person are confidential and may not be
 released to any other person or agency except as provided by this
 section or by other law; and
 (13)  provide a procedure that permits the agencies to
 share confidential information while preserving the confidential
 nature of the information.
 (e)  The agencies shall ensure that a state-level
 interagency staffing group provides:
 (1)  information and guidance to local-level
 interagency staffing groups regarding:
 (A)  the availability of programs and resources in
 the community; and
 (B)  best practices for addressing the needs of
 persons with complex needs in the least restrictive setting
 appropriate; and
 (2)  a biennial report to the administrative head of
 each agency, the legislature, and the governor that includes:
 (A) [(1)]  the number of persons served through
 the local-level interagency staffing groups and the outcomes of the
 services provided;
 (B) [(2)]  a description of any barriers
 identified to the state's ability to provide effective services to
 persons needing multiagency services; and
 (C) [(3)]  any other information relevant to
 improving the delivery of services to persons needing multiagency
 services.
 (f)  In this section, "least restrictive setting" means a
 service setting for a person that, in comparison to other available
 service settings:
 (1)  is most able to meet the identified needs of the
 person;
 (2)  prioritizes a home and community-based care
 setting; and
 (3)  engages the strengths of the family.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, but not later than December 1, 2017, the Health and
 Human Services Commission, the Department of Family and Protective
 Services, the Department of State Health Services, the Texas
 Education Agency, the Texas Correctional Office on Offenders with
 Medical or Mental Impairments, the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice, the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs, the
 Texas Workforce Commission, and the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department shall update the joint memorandum of understanding
 required under Section 531.055, Government Code, as amended by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *