E
|
06/06/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/06/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3567
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2630
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2878
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
05/14/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1234
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3355
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3355
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1193
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 1(a) and Rule 8, Section 1(c)
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2347
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2074
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|