Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2023
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|