1 | 1 | | By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2911 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
4 | 4 | | Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
5 | 5 | | Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to a reemployment program as a condition of community |
---|
12 | 12 | | supervision for certain veterans who commit a misdemeanor offense. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 42A, Code of Criminal Procedure, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Subchapter H-1 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SUBCHAPTER H-1. VETERANS REEMPLOYMENT PROGRAM |
---|
17 | 17 | | Art. 42A.381. VETERANS REEMPLOYMENT PROGRAM. In this |
---|
18 | 18 | | subchapter "veterans reemployment program" means a program that |
---|
19 | 19 | | provides education and training to veterans with the goal that the |
---|
20 | 20 | | veterans become gainfully employed. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Art. 42A.382. ELIGIBILITY. (a) A defendant placed on |
---|
22 | 22 | | deferred adjudication community supervision for or convicted of a |
---|
23 | 23 | | misdemeanor offense is eligible to participate in a veterans |
---|
24 | 24 | | reemployment program established under this subchapter if the |
---|
25 | 25 | | defendant is a veteran of the United States armed forces, including |
---|
26 | 26 | | a member of the reserves, national guard, or state guard. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (b) The judge granting community supervision to a defendant |
---|
28 | 28 | | described by Subsection (a) shall inform the defendant of the |
---|
29 | 29 | | defendant's eligibility for the program but may not require the |
---|
30 | 30 | | defendant to participate in the program. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) A judge may additionally impose any condition of |
---|
32 | 32 | | community supervision that the judge is authorized to impose under |
---|
33 | 33 | | this chapter on a defendant who chooses to participate in the |
---|
34 | 34 | | program under this subchapter. |
---|
35 | 35 | | Art. 42A.383. EDUCATION AND TRAINING COURSES. (a) A |
---|
36 | 36 | | participant in the program shall diligently attend workforce |
---|
37 | 37 | | development education and training courses developed or approved by |
---|
38 | 38 | | the Texas Workforce Commission under Chapter 316, Labor Code, as |
---|
39 | 39 | | directed by the court. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (b) The education and training courses under this article |
---|
41 | 41 | | must focus on providing a participant with useful workplace skills |
---|
42 | 42 | | most likely to lead to gainful employment by the participant. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (c) The education and training courses may be |
---|
44 | 44 | | individualized based on any physical or intellectual limitations of |
---|
45 | 45 | | the participant. |
---|
46 | 46 | | Art. 42A.384. COMPLETION OF PROGRAM. A participant |
---|
47 | 47 | | successfully completes the veterans reemployment program if the |
---|
48 | 48 | | participant completes the education and training courses required |
---|
49 | 49 | | by the court and: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) obtains employment and retains that employment for |
---|
51 | 51 | | three continuous months; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (2) diligently searches for employment for a |
---|
53 | 53 | | continuous period of six months; or |
---|
54 | 54 | | (3) is determined by the court to be unemployable |
---|
55 | 55 | | because of a disability. |
---|
56 | 56 | | Art. 42A.385. FAILURE TO COMPLETE PROGRAM. (a) The judge |
---|
57 | 57 | | may not revoke the community supervision of a defendant who fails to |
---|
58 | 58 | | complete the program under this subchapter. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (b) If the defendant fails to complete the program under |
---|
60 | 60 | | this subchapter, the judge may: |
---|
61 | 61 | | (1) modify the defendant's conditions of community |
---|
62 | 62 | | supervision; and |
---|
63 | 63 | | (2) extend the period of community supervision so that |
---|
64 | 64 | | the defendant may comply with the conditions under Subdivision (1). |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter E-1, Chapter 411, Government Code, is |
---|
66 | 66 | | amended by adding Section 411.0729 to read as follows: |
---|
67 | 67 | | Sec. 411.0729. PROCEDURE FOR CERTAIN VETERANS. On |
---|
68 | 68 | | successful completion of the veterans reemployment program created |
---|
69 | 69 | | under Subchapter H-1, Chapter 42A, Code of Criminal Procedure, and |
---|
70 | 70 | | all other conditions of the defendant's community supervision, |
---|
71 | 71 | | regardless of whether the defendant meets the eligibility criteria |
---|
72 | 72 | | under this subchapter, after notice to the state and a hearing on |
---|
73 | 73 | | whether issuance of an order of nondisclosure is in the best |
---|
74 | 74 | | interest of justice, the court shall enter an order of |
---|
75 | 75 | | nondisclosure with respect to all records of the offense for which |
---|
76 | 76 | | the defendant was convicted or placed on deferred adjudication |
---|
77 | 77 | | community supervision. |
---|
78 | 78 | | SECTION 3. Subtitle B, Title 4, Labor Code, is amended by |
---|
79 | 79 | | adding Chapter 316 to read as follows: |
---|
80 | 80 | | CHAPTER 316. VETERANS REEMPLOYMENT EDUCATION AND TRAINING COURSES |
---|
81 | 81 | | Sec. 316.001. VETERANS REEMPLOYMENT PROGRAM. In this |
---|
82 | 82 | | chapter "veterans reemployment program" means the community |
---|
83 | 83 | | supervision program created under Subchapter H-1, Chapter 42A, Code |
---|
84 | 84 | | of Criminal Procedure. |
---|
85 | 85 | | Sec. 316.002. EDUCATION AND TRAINING COURSES. (a) The |
---|
86 | 86 | | commission shall develop or approve education and training courses |
---|
87 | 87 | | to assist veterans convicted of or placed on deferred adjudication |
---|
88 | 88 | | community supervision for a misdemeanor offense under Subchapter |
---|
89 | 89 | | H-1, Chapter 42A, Code of Criminal Procedure, in obtaining |
---|
90 | 90 | | workforce skills and becoming gainfully employed. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (b) The education and training courses must provide |
---|
92 | 92 | | instruction in workforce skills appropriate for veterans with |
---|
93 | 93 | | disabilities. |
---|
94 | 94 | | SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2018, the Texas |
---|
95 | 95 | | Workforce Commission shall develop or approve education and |
---|
96 | 96 | | training courses as required under Chapter 316, Labor Code, as |
---|
97 | 97 | | added by this Act. |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 5. Subchapter H-1, Chapter 42A, Code of Criminal |
---|
99 | 99 | | Procedure, applies only to a person placed on community |
---|
100 | 100 | | supervision, including deferred adjudication community |
---|
101 | 101 | | supervision, on or after January 1, 2018. |
---|
102 | 102 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
103 | 103 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
104 | 104 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
105 | 105 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
106 | 106 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
107 | 107 | | * * * * * |
---|