Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2933 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bonnen of Brazoria, Cosper H.B. No. 2933
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 11, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing and regulation of military optometrists
 and therapeutic optometrists who provide voluntary charity care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 351, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 351.266 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.266.  MILITARY LIMITED VOLUNTEER LICENSE. (a) The
 board shall adopt rules relating to the issuance of a military
 limited volunteer license under this section.
 (b)  The board may issue a military limited volunteer license
 to practice optometry or therapeutic optometry to an applicant who:
 (1)  is licensed and in good standing, or was licensed
 and retired in good standing, as an optometrist or therapeutic
 optometrist in another state;
 (2)  is or was authorized as an optometrist or
 therapeutic optometrist to treat personnel enlisted in a branch of
 the United States armed forces or veterans; and
 (3)  meets any other requirement prescribed by board
 rule.
 (c)  The board may not issue a license under this section to
 an applicant who:
 (1)  holds an optometry or therapeutic optometry
 license that:
 (A)  is currently under active investigation; or
 (B)  is or was subject to a disciplinary order or
 action or to denial by another jurisdiction;
 (2)  holds a license to prescribe, dispense,
 administer, supply, or sell a controlled substance that:
 (A)  is currently under active investigation; or
 (B)  is or was subject to a disciplinary order or
 action or to denial by another jurisdiction; or
 (3)  has been convicted of, is on deferred adjudication
 community supervision or deferred disposition for, or is under
 active investigation for the commission of:
 (A)  a felony; or
 (B)  a misdemeanor involving moral turpitude.
 (d)  An optometrist or therapeutic optometrist may practice
 optometry or therapeutic optometry under a license issued under
 this section only at a clinic that primarily treats indigent
 patients. The optometrist or therapeutic optometrist may not
 directly or indirectly receive compensation or anything of monetary
 value for optometric services rendered at the clinic.
 (e)  A military limited volunteer license holder is subject
 to board rules, including rules regarding disciplinary action,
 license registration and renewal, and continuing medical
 education.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *