Senate | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2778 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#900 | Journal Page: 2778 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2778 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2778 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2688 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2688 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 802 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 802 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed |