House | 05/10/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2886 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair | ||
House | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 849 | |
House | 03/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 849 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Filed |