Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3049 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 3049
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the number of hours of work experience required of a
 plumber's apprentice to take an examination for a plumber's
 license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1301.354, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  At the applicant's request, the board may credit an
 applicant under Subsection (b) with up to 250 hours of the work
 experience required before taking an examination if the applicant
 has completed a coherent sequence of courses in the construction
 trade that are offered through a career and technical education
 program that is approved by the State Board of Education.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *