E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6066
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5683
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3567
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5095
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4361
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1367
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2018
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#494
|
Journal Page: 2018
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2018
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2018
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 862
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 862
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|