Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3055 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3055
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the restrictions on political activities for a county
 elections administrator.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.035, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), a [A] county
 elections administrator may not be a candidate for a public office
 or an office of a political party, hold a public office, or hold an
 office of or position in a political party. At the time an
 administrator becomes a candidate or accepts an office or position
 in violation of this subsection, the administrator vacates the
 position of administrator.
 (d)  For a county with a population of less than 1,000, the
 county elections administrator may hold or be a candidate for a
 public office if:
 (1)  no part of the jurisdiction of the office is
 located in the county where the person serves as the elections
 administrator; and
 (2)  any election for that office is a nonpartisan
 election.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *