E | 06/15/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6065 | |
E | 05/25/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5573 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3318 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4804 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4837 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4000 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1662 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1662 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1621 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#654 | Journal Page: 2336 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2271 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2271 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 933 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 933 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed |