Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3130 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3130
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of an educational and vocational
 training pilot program for certain state jail felony defendants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter L, Chapter 42A, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 42A.562 to read as follows:
 Art. 42A.562.  PLACEMENT ON COMMUNITY SUPERVISION;
 EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING PILOT PROGRAM.  (a)  Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), a judge assessing punishment in a state
 jail felony case may suspend the imposition of the sentence and
 place the defendant on community supervision with the conditions
 that the defendant:
 (1)  submit at the beginning of the term of community
 supervision to confinement in a state jail felony facility for a
 term not to exceed 90 days; and
 (2)  participate in a program operated under Section
 507.007, Government Code.
 (b)  A judge may not place a defendant on community
 supervision under this article if the defendant is or has
 previously been convicted of an offense under Title 5, Penal Code.
 (c)  Before a judge may place a defendant on community
 supervision under this article, the defendant must be assessed
 using the risk and needs assessment instrument adopted under
 Section 501.0921, Government Code, or a similar instrument that
 takes into consideration the defendant's prior criminal history.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Article 42A.559(c), the judge shall
 credit against the time the defendant is required to serve under
 Subsection (a)(1) time the defendant served in a county jail from
 the time of the defendant's arrest until sentencing.
 (e)  Notwithstanding the minimum period of community
 supervision provided by Article 42A.553(a), a judge placing a
 defendant on community supervision under this article shall impose
 a period of community supervision not to exceed 270 days.
 (f)  A defendant placed on community supervision under this
 article must participate fully in the program described by
 Subsection (a)(2). The provisions of Subchapter P authorizing the
 judge to revoke a defendant's community supervision or otherwise
 sanction the defendant apply with respect to a defendant who
 violates the requirement of this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 507, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 507.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 507.007.  EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING PILOT
 PROGRAM. (a) The department shall establish a pilot program to
 provide educational and vocational training, employment, and
 reentry services to defendants placed on community supervision and
 required to serve a term of confinement in a state jail felony
 facility under Article 42A.562, Code of Criminal Procedure.
 (b)  The department, in consultation with interested
 parties, shall determine the eligibility criteria for a defendant
 to participate in the pilot program, including requiring the
 defendant to arrange for suitable housing while participating in
 the program.
 (c)  The department, in consultation with interested
 parties, shall determine not more than four locations in this state
 in which the pilot program will operate. In determining the
 locations, the department shall consider locating the program in
 various regions throughout the state, including locations having a
 variety of population sizes. The department shall also give
 consideration to whether a risk and needs assessment is generally
 conducted before sentencing defendants in a particular location and
 to the degree to which local judges show support for the
 establishment of the program in a particular location.
 (d)  The department shall issue a request for proposals from
 public or private entities to provide services through the pilot
 program. The department shall select one or more qualified
 applicants to provide services through the program to eligible
 defendants.
 (e)  The pilot program consists of approximately 180 days of
 employment-related services and support and must include:
 (1)  an initial period during which the defendant will:
 (A)  receive training and education related to the
 defendant's vocational goals; and
 (B)  be employed by the provider;
 (2)  job placement services designed to provide
 employment for the defendant after the period described by
 Subdivision (1);
 (3)  assistance in obtaining a high school diploma or
 industry certification for applicable defendants;
 (4)  life-skills training, including information about
 budgeting and money management; and
 (5)  counseling and mental health services.
 (f)  The department shall limit the number of defendants who
 may participate in the program to not more than 45 defendants per
 quarter per program location.
 (g)  The department shall pay providers not less than $40 per
 day for each participant.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than September 1, 2019, the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall establish the pilot program
 required by Section 507.007, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Article 42A.562, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a defendant who receives a
 sentence of confinement in a state jail on or after September 1,
 2019. A defendant who receives a sentence of confinement in a state
 jail before September 1, 2019, is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *