Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3157 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bonnen of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3157
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for screenings in public or private
 schools to detect vision disorders of students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The rules must allow an individual who attends a
 public or private school to be screened using photoscreening to
 detect vision disorders.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to implement
 the changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *