E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3043
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3043
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|