Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2110
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1762
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1762
|
Senate
|
05/05/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2521
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|