E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/25/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4837
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2240
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1367
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#494
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|