Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3283 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3283
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 16 in
 Duval County as the Al Dean Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  AL DEAN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  The portion of
 State Highway 16 in Duval County between the northern municipal
 boundary of Freer and the southern boundary of McMullen County is
 designated as the Al Dean Memorial Highway. The designation is in
 addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 highway number, the designation as the Al Dean Memorial Highway,
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *