Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3329 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 3329
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 11, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulation of electricians by local governments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1305.201, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  This chapter does not prohibit a municipality or region
 from regulating electricians or residential appliance installers
 by:
 (1)  enacting an ordinance requiring inspections;
 (2)  offering examinations;
 (3)  issuing municipal or regional licenses; or
 (4)  collecting permit fees for municipal or regional
 licenses and examinations from [electricians and] appliance
 installers for work performed in the municipality or region.
 (f)  A municipality or region may not collect a permit fee,
 registration fee, administrative fee, or any other fee from an
 electrician who holds a license issued under this chapter for work
 performed in the municipality or region.  This subsection does not
 prohibit a municipality or region from collecting a building permit
 fee.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *