Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3055
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1729
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2331
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#647
|
Journal Page: 2331
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2331
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2331
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/2/17 2:40 PM
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 935
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 935
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|