Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3337 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: Bonnen of Brazoria, et al. H.B. No. 3337
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain persons to teach a driver
 education course.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1001.112(a), Education Code, the
 substance of which was transferred from Section 521.205(a),
 Transportation Code, by Chapter 1044 (H.B. 1786), Acts of the 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is amended to conform to
 Chapter 567 (H.B. 2708), Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, and further amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission by rule shall provide for approval of a
 driver education course conducted by a person designated under
 Subsection (a-1) or by the parent, stepparent, foster parent, legal
 guardian, grandparent, or step-grandparent of a person who is
 required to complete a driver education course to obtain a Class C
 license.  The rules must provide that the student driver spend a
 minimum number of hours in classroom and behind-the-wheel
 instruction and that the person conducting the course:
 (1)  possess a valid license for the preceding three
 years that has not been suspended, revoked, or forfeited in the past
 three years for an offense that involves the operation of a motor
 vehicle;
 (2)  has not been convicted of:
 (A)  criminally negligent homicide; or
 (B)  driving while intoxicated; and
 (3)  [is not disabled because of mental illness; and
 [(4)]  does not have six or more points assigned to the
 person's driver's license under Subchapter B, Chapter 708,
 Transportation Code, at the time the person begins conducting the
 course.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1001.112, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The parent of a person who is required to complete a
 driver education course to obtain a Class C license may designate a
 person 25 years of age or older to conduct a driver education course
 under Subsection (a) if the parent has a disability.  In this
 subsection, "disability" means, with respect to an individual, a
 physical or mental impairment that substantially limits one or more
 major life activities.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Section 521.1655(a-1), Transportation Code,
 is repealed.
 (b)  Section 521.205(a), Transportation Code, as amended by
 Chapter 567 (H.B. 2708), Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, is repealed to conform to the repeal of Section
 521.205, Transportation Code, by Chapter 1044 (H.B. 1786), Acts of
 the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *