|
06/15/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|