Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3349 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3349
1+By: Gervin-Hawkins, Guillen, Phelan H.B. No. 3349
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2017;
4+ May 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
6+ Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to creating an abbreviated certification program and
613 probationary and standard certificates for trade and industrial
714 workforce training.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
1017 amended by adding Sections 21.0442 and 21.0491 to read as follows:
1118 Sec. 21.0442. EDUCATOR PREPARATION PROGRAM FOR
1219 PROBATIONARY AND STANDARD TRADE AND INDUSTRIAL WORKFORCE TRAINING
1320 CERTIFICATES. (a) The board shall propose rules under this
1421 subchapter to create an abbreviated educator preparation program
1522 for a person seeking certification in trade and industrial
1623 workforce training.
1724 (b) A person is eligible for admission to an educator
1825 preparation program created under this section only if the person:
1926 (1) has been issued a high school diploma or a
2027 postsecondary credential, certificate, or degree;
2128 (2) has seven years of full-time wage-earning
2229 experience within the preceding 10 years in an approved occupation
2330 for which instruction is offered;
2431 (3) holds with respect to that occupation a current
2532 license, certificate, or registration, as applicable, issued by a
2633 nationally recognized accrediting agency based on a recognized test
2734 or measurement; and
2835 (4) within the period described by Subdivision (2),
2936 has not been the subject of a complaint filed with a licensing
3037 entity or other agency that regulates the occupation of the person,
3138 other than a complaint that was determined baseless or unfounded by
3239 that entity or agency.
3340 (c) In proposing rules for an educator preparation program
3441 under this section, the board shall ensure that the program
3542 requires at least 80 hours of classroom instruction in:
3643 (1) a specific pedagogy;
3744 (2) creating lesson plans;
3845 (3) creating student assessment instruments;
3946 (4) classroom management; and
4047 (5) relevant federal and state education laws.
4148 Sec. 21.0491. PROBATIONARY AND STANDARD TRADE AND
4249 INDUSTRIAL WORKFORCE TRAINING CERTIFICATES. (a) To provide a
4350 continuing additional source of teachers to provide workforce
4451 training, the board shall establish a probationary trade and
4552 industrial workforce training certificate and a standard trade and
4653 industrial workforce training certificate that may be obtained
4754 through an abbreviated educator preparation program under Section
4855 21.0442.
4956 (b) To be eligible for a probationary certificate under this
5057 section, a person must:
5158 (1) satisfactorily complete the course work for that
5259 certificate in an educator preparation program under Section
5360 21.0442; and
5461 (2) satisfy any other requirements prescribed by the
5562 board.
5663 (c) To be eligible for a standard certificate under this
5764 section, a person must:
5865 (1) hold a probationary certificate issued under this
5966 section;
6067 (2) be employed by:
6168 (A) a public or private primary or secondary
6269 school; or
6370 (B) an institution of higher education or an
6471 independent or private institution of higher education as those
6572 terms are defined by Section 61.003; and
6673 (3) perform satisfactorily on a standard trade and
6774 industrial workforce training certificate examination prescribed
6875 by the board.
6976 (d) The limitation imposed by Section 21.048(a-1) on the
7077 number of administrations of an examination does not apply to the
7178 administration of the standard trade and industrial workforce
7279 training certificate examination prescribed by the board.
7380 (e) Notwithstanding any other law, the board may administer
7481 the standard trade and industrial workforce training certificate
7582 examination to a person who satisfies the requirements of
7683 Subsections (c)(1) and (2).
7784 (f) The board shall propose rules to:
7885 (1) specify the term of a probationary certificate and
7986 a standard certificate issued under this section; and
8087 (2) establish the requirements for renewal of a
8188 standard certificate.
8289 SECTION 2. The State Board for Educator Certification shall
8390 propose rules:
8491 (1) establishing requirements for a probationary
8592 trade and industrial workforce training certificate as required by
8693 Section 21.0491, Education Code, as added by this Act;
8794 (2) prescribing an examination for a standard trade
8895 and industrial workforce training certificate examination as
8996 required by Section 21.0491, Education Code, as added by this Act;
9097 and
9198 (3) establishing standards to govern the approval and
9299 renewal of approval of educator preparation programs for
93100 certification in trade and industrial workforce training.
94- SECTION 3. This Act takes effect only if a specific
95- appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
96- general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
97- SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
101+ SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
98102 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
99103 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
100104 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
101105 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
102- ______________________________ ______________________________
103- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
104- I certify that H.B. No. 3349 was passed by the House on May
105- 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, 1 present, not
106- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
107- No. 3349 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0,
108- 2 present, not voting.
109- ______________________________
110- Chief Clerk of the House
111- I certify that H.B. No. 3349 was passed by the Senate, with
112- amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
113- 0.
114- ______________________________
115- Secretary of the Senate
116- APPROVED: __________________
117- Date
118- __________________
119- Governor
106+ * * * * *