Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 9, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill May 7, 2017